Financial history SHEPSHED NON-CONFORMIST EDUCATIONAL TRUST FUND

Charity number: 528051
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.74k £3.69k £4.89k £4.62k £4.51k
Total expenditure £2.87k £2.78k £6.18k £5.14k £4.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A