Trustees NEWCASTLE DIOCESAN EDUCATION BOARD
Charity number: 528076

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Massey | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Frier | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Simpson | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sam Lochead | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alan Hardie | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Akers | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Julia Lacey | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lee Batson | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Rt Revd Helen-Ann Hartley | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Gill Alexander | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Gary Holmes | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev'd Dr Pauline Hilary Pearson | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|||||
RICHARD RESTALL | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.