Governing document SOUTHWELL MINSTER SCHOOL
Charity number: 528257

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 28 SEP 1909 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19 SEP 1922 AS AMENDED ON 17 JAN 1956 AS AMENDED ON 17 FEB 1976 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 31 DEC 1976 AS AMENDED ON 01 SEP 2004
Charitable objects
A DAY AND BOARDING SCHOOL FOR BOYS AND GIRLS TO BE MAINTAINED IN OR NEAR THE PARISH OF SOUTHWELL AND TO BE CONDUCTED AS AN AIDED SECONDARY SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.