MANSFIELD MECHANICS INSTITUTE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Snooker club, bridge club, bridge classes, polling station, meeting house, local drs surgery car park.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £4,968 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 13 June 1969: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Maude Savage | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Wendy Dixon | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Elizabeth Walker | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Anthony Brewer | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
ROBERT WYATT | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Stephen Cooper | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Romuald Stanislaw Zygadlo | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Susan Anne Wright | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Kendal Jane Holdrick | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Valerie Hill | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
PATRICIA MARGARET BAILEY | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.03k | £5.55k | £17.81k | £12.13k | £18.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.91k | £15.13k | £13.83k | £13.43k | £16.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £12.84k | N/A | £4.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 December 2020 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 28TH MAY 1969
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE, OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF MANSFIELD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Kirkby Close
SOUTHWELL
NG25 0DG
- Phone:
- 07572012023
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window