Trustees TOWN BRANCH (CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES) EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 528587
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lesley Margaret Wells Trustee 27 March 2025
FRIENDS OF ROYAL DERBY HOSPITAL
Received: On time
LEAGUE OF FRIENDS, ROYAL DERBY HOSPITAL
Recently registered
BEYNE SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Terence Smith Trustee 11 January 2024
BEYNE SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
James Tickle Trustee 14 October 2021
BEYNE SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Steve Jackson Trustee 20 June 2019
BEYNE SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Stuart John Anderson Trustee 21 June 2018
BURTON HOPE
Received: 61 days late
BEYNE SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Conor Wileman Trustee 12 June 2014
BEYNE SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JAMES MUIR Trustee
BEYNE SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time