Financial history RUGBY SCHOOL

Charity number: 528752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £47.94m £41.03m £45.12m £50.74m £54.51m
Total expenditure £37.68m £41.96m £46.18m £53.16m £59.38m
Income from government contracts £60.92k £52.38k £90.18k £205.48k £241.97k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.25k £4.65k
Income - Donations and legacies £11.06m £907.00k £2.06m £841.00k £863.00k
Income - Other trading activities £2.11m £873.00k £1.76m £2.99m £3.80m
Income - Charitable activities £28.38m £32.76m £36.64m £40.80m £43.64m
Income - Endowments £251.00k £188.00k £1.38m £258.00k £0
Income - Investment £5.59m £5.18m £5.96m £6.35m £6.17m
Income - Other £1.04m £1.50m £77.00k £13.00k £113.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £467.00k £521.00k £863.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £34.34m £38.82m £41.78m £48.41m £53.34m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.34m £3.14m £4.40m £4.75m £6.04m
Expenditure - Governance £355.00k £386.00k £315.00k £332.00k £335.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £681.00k £705.00k £686.21k
Expenditure - Investment management £1.83m £1.90m £2.04m £2.15m £2.89m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0