Financial history THE RUGBY SCHOOL GENERAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 528756
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £196.15k £56.40k £1.16k £46.19k £22.94k
Total expenditure £196.15k £56.40k £1.16k £46.19k £22.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A