Financial history RUGBY SCHOOL COMBINED WAR MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 528760
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £26.24k £22.55k £26.32k £31.62k £35.30k
Total expenditure £63.08k £58.38k £52.74k £54.16k £57.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A