Financial history THE GRAMMAR SCHOOL OF KING EDWARD VI AT STRATFORD-UPON-AVON

Charity number: 528769
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £936.99k £520.40k £1.03m £643.38k £798.33k
Total expenditure £978.80k £741.83k £829.78k £729.18k £739.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £98.40k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £653.11k £346.22k £687.99k £610.42k £766.11k
Income - Other trading activities £261.24k £147.47k £311.70k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £22.64k £26.64k £29.39k £32.90k £32.16k
Income - Other £0 £60 £60 £60 £60
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £608.94k £507.61k £526.18k £625.12k £626.32k
Expenditure - Raising funds £49.81k £66.65k £46.28k £101.76k £108.66k
Expenditure - Governance £21.50k £19.78k £21.27k £28.33k £28.26k
Expenditure - Grants institution £374.12k £293.47k £323.61k £393.44k £293.11k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £320.05k £167.57k £257.32k £2.31k £4.42k