Accounts and annual returns THE QUAKER PEACE STUDIES TRUST

Charity Number: 529095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 13 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 23 October 2024 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 05 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 15 October 2022 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 09 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required