Accounts and annual returns ACKWORTH SCHOOL

Charity Number: 529280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 27 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 04 February 2025 219 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 04 February 2025 585 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 February 2025 950 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1429 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1429 days