CHURCH BURGESSES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 529357
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Educational grants to young people under the age of 25 resident within Sheffield city boundary. Grants are available to both individuals and to youth organisations. Grants are made to cover Gap year trips, sporting and musical tuition and towards education, usually below tertiary level. Grants are also made to local Church schools and to Church-based youth work.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £187,526
Total expenditure: £247,547

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 July 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR D STANLEY Chair 13 May 2008
CHURCH BURGESSES TRUST
Received: On time
WILLIAM ELLIS BEQUEST
Received: On time
THE HOUNSFIELD PENSIONS CHARITY
Received: On time
SIR ARTHUR HALL MEMORIAL LECTURE FUND
Received: On time
Prof Robert Edward Coleman Trustee 11 February 2025
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ECCLESALL, SHEFFIELD
Received: On time
CHURCH BURGESSES TRUST
Received: On time
THE HOUNSFIELD PENSIONS CHARITY
Received: On time
WILLIAM ELLIS BEQUEST
Received: On time
STEPHEN ECCLESTON Trustee 24 May 2022
THE HOUNSFIELD PENSIONS CHARITY
Received: On time
CHURCH BURGESSES TRUST
Received: On time
WILLIAM ELLIS BEQUEST
Received: On time
Dr Linda Margaret Kirk Trustee 09 February 2021
University of Sheffield African Scholarship
Received: On time
DAVID FRANCIS BOOKER Trustee 11 February 2014
RANMOOR PARISH CENTRE TRUST
Received: On time
THE HOUNSFIELD PENSIONS CHARITY
Received: On time
CHURCH BURGESSES TRUST
Received: On time
WILLIAM ELLIS BEQUEST
Received: On time
WHIRLOW GRANGE LIMITED
Received: On time
REVD W H THOMAS Trustee 27 November 2012
ST HILD COLLEGE
Received: On time
Rev STEPHEN ALBERT PAUL HUNTER JP Trustee 06 May 1998
CHURCH BURGESSES TRUST
Received: On time
WILLIAM ELLIS BEQUEST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £212.91k £153.48k £223.47k £178.43k £187.53k
Total expenditure £174.76k £109.97k £153.57k £190.84k £247.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WRIGLEYS SOLICITORS LLP
DERWENT HOUSE
150 ARUNDEL GATE
SHEFFIELD
S1 2FN
Phone:
01142675596
Email:
No information available