Financial history NEVILL'S WORKHOUSE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 529521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £12.27k £9.04k £9.26k £10.47k £11.50k
Total expenditure £5.00k £11.58k £7.56k £10.09k £14.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A