NEVILL'S WORKHOUSE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides grants or financial assistance for educational purposes to those children in financial need and who live in the parishes of Well and Snape.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 24 March 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leonard Mark Sampson | Chair |
|
||||||
Alison Elizabeth Knopp | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joan Wilson | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Brown | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Johnson | Trustee | 01 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Stuart Northcliffe Lancaster | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Mark Lewis Glatman | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robert Abel | Trustee | 04 August 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.27k | £9.04k | £9.26k | £10.47k | £11.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £11.58k | £7.56k | £10.09k | £14.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 01/11/1906 DATED 20/12/2013 as amended on 11 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
PRIZES FOR BOYS/GIRLS FOR PROFICIENCY AT A PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOL, IN ASSISTING THE CHILD TO CONTINUE HIS OR HER EDUCATION. DAY OR BOARDING EXHIBITIONS, FOR GIRLS IN DOMESTIC ECONOMY AND BOYS TECHNICAL PROFESSIONAL, OR INDUSTRIAL INSTRUCTION, AWARDED TO CHILDREN WHOSE PARENTS ARE RESIDENT IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF WELL.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF SNAPE AND WELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Acclom House
Well Bank
Well
BEDALE
North Yorkshire
DL8 2QF
- Phone:
- 01677470326
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window