Trustees Cropton Educational Trust

Charity number: 529637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Dyball Chair 17 May 2024
None on record
Laura Maher Trustee 25 November 2024
COMMUNITY COUNSELLING (NORTH YORKSHIRE) LIMITED
Received: On time
Andrew Collinson Trustee 19 February 2024
None on record
Elizabeth Rosemary Willoughby Trustee 27 February 2023
None on record
Vanessa Marie Smallwood secretary Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record