Financial history THE NORTHERN MILL ENGINE SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity Number: 532259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £8.51k £16.09k £27.45k £30.48k £35.55k
Total expenditure £7.96k £11.87k £14.94k £22.90k £24.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A