Financial history MILNTHORPE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 700132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £10.54k £9.75k £15.45k £17.52k £16.09k
Total expenditure £12.08k £4.93k £11.45k £15.88k £26.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A