Trustees MILNTHORPE MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 700132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lisa Jane Ashworth-Whittaker Chair 07 March 2014
None on record
LINDA BAVERSTOCK Trustee 10 July 2023
None on record
Roger Hilton Whittaker Trustee 10 January 2022
None on record
Hazel Jones Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
Steven Andrew Hurst Trustee 10 June 2019
None on record
Emma Dickinson Trustee 05 June 2019
None on record
Susan Cox Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
David Turnough Trustee 01 December 2018
None on record
Stewart Gott Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Kath Craig Trustee 01 May 2012
None on record
SHEILA ASHBURNER Trustee
None on record
MRS JEN SCROGHAM Trustee
None on record
SUE HILTON Trustee
None on record
KEVIN ANTHONY JAMES Trustee
None on record
KEITH DIXON Trustee
None on record