Accounts and annual returns RUTLAND LOCAL HISTORY AND RECORD SOCIETY

Charity Number: 700273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 April 2024 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required