Governing document RUTLAND LOCAL HISTORY AND RECORD SOCIETY
Charity Number: 700273

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 MARCH 1976 AS AMENDED 25 FEBRUARY 1988 6 JUNE 1991 AND 6 MAY 1993 AS AMENDED ON 09 MAY 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY DEVELOPING PUBLIC INTEREST IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE HISTORY OF RUTLAND.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.