Trustees RUTLAND LOCAL HISTORY AND RECORD SOCIETY
Charity Number: 700273

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ian Edwin Ryder | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Edward Graham Heckels | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul David Bland | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Susan Martin | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Hunt | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Joyce Martin | Trustee | 10 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL TREVOR REEVE | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Carole Jane Bancroft-Turner | Trustee | 11 September 2013 |
|
|||||
ROBERT FRANCIS OVENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT EDWARD CLAYTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR MICHAEL TILLBROOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL FRISBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIMOTHY HATTON McKENZIE CLOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HILARY JOHN CROWDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JILL ANGELA KIMBER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAURICE EDWARD BAINES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.