Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ST GREGORYS MINSTER KIRKDALE
Charity number: 700344

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Antony Pritchett | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Shaw | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tim Ramsdale | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Farrell Phillips Burnett | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Lloyd | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev Susan Binks | Trustee | 12 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Diana Pearce | Trustee | 07 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Margery Roberts | Trustee | 07 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN NEVILLE TURNER MA | Trustee | 12 March 1992 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.