THE JUNIOR SCHOOL AT THE ROYAL NORTHERN COLLEGE OF MUSIC ENDOWMENT TRUST

Charity number: 700664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The education of the general public in the study, appreciation and practice of music and the allied arts by endowing, furthering and supporting the objects and work of the Junior School at the Royal Northern College of Music. This is achieved by the giving of scholarships and bursaries, the purchase of musical instruments and financial support of activities within the Junior RNCM.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £25,748
Total expenditure: £26,702

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 September 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nigel Hirst Chair 01 July 2010
NORBURY VILLAGE HALL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE INSTITUTION OF CHEMICAL ENGINEERS
Received: On time
Alexandra Jane Mayer Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record
Eileen Clare Hoare Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
Christine Margaret Wardle Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
David John Hoult Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
Martin Duckorth Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
JOHN BRIERLEY TURNER Trustee 01 September 2013
RAWSTHORNE TRUST
Received: On time
THE IDA CARROLL TRUST
Received: On time
THE GOLLAND TRUST
Received: On time
THE PITFIELD TRUST
Received: On time
THE DOUGLAS STEELE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Anna Elizabeth Wright Trustee 21 June 2012
MUSICA SECRETA
Received: On time
NORTH WEST EARLY MUSIC FORUM
Received: On time
DIDSBURY BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £15.84k £26.71k £32.74k £74.41k £25.75k
Total expenditure £25.18k £10.32k £13.18k £24.57k £26.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 24 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 24 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 13 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 08 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ROYAL NORTHERN COLLEGE OF MUSIC
124 OXFORD ROAD
MANCHESTER
M13 9RD
Phone:
01619075401
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available