YR YMDDIRIEDOLAETH DDARLLEDU GYMREIG (THE WELSH BROADCASTING TRUST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion and support of educational activities in relation to television, film, radio and new media. To expand and enrich the range of skills and experience for the media of the future.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 28 October 1988: Standard registration
- YMDDIRIED (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geraint Wyn Ellis | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Rhys Owen Williams | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
GARETH MORLAIS | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
SIWAN JOBBINS | Trustee | 16 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Morris | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.84k | £10.28k | £10.78k | £8.71k | £8.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.74k | £34.24k | £45.15k | £29.55k | £31.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 November 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 MARCH 1988
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PEOPLE OF WALES AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE HISTORY, ART, CRAFT, MUSIC, LANGUAGE, LITERATURE AND DRAMA OF WALES. (II) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY AS SHALL NOT BE INCONSISTENT WITH THE OBJECTS SET OUT IN (I).
Area of benefit
WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
ISLWYN
LON TERFYN
MORFA NEFYN
PWLLHELI
LL53 6AP
- Phone:
- 01758720132
- Email:
- post@ymddiried.cymru
- Website:
-
ymddiried.cymru
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window