Trustees THE CITY OF YORK GUILDHALL ORCHESTRA
Charity number: 700863

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Margaret Green CBE | Chair | 07 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Malcolm Tooze | Trustee | 02 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Small | Trustee | 02 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Charnock | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Easterbrook | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angelo Braganza | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rome Sigsworth | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CAVELL | Trustee | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WILSON | Trustee | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY EGGINTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FELICITY JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.