Financial history BARNSLEY BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 701071
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.85k £12.68k £17.59k £14.05k £16.94k
Total expenditure £17.92k £5.26k £3.40k £4.15k £4.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 N/A N/A N/A N/A