Financial history FRIENDS OF WHITBY ABBEY

Charity number: 701566
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £849 £732 £827 £1.08k £957
Total expenditure £668 £127 £1.25k £243 £755
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A