Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF CANNOCK TRUST FUND

Charity number: 701681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £44.35k £5.80k £22.46k £21.14k £25.60k
Total expenditure £44.46k £10.30k £22.95k £19.63k £29.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A