Financial history NORTON HOUSING AND SUPPORT LTD

Charity number: 701800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £955.20k £892.51k £921.54k £1.10m £988.43k
Total expenditure £855.02k £894.81k £927.52k £1.00m £1.03m
Income from government contracts £849.71k £149.58k £836.38k £963.14k £803.27k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £25.60k £7.34k £14.81k £15.37k £8.06k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £901.45k £866.66k £879.16k £1.01m £971.06k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.25k £2.39k £354 £381 £0
Income - Other £23.91k £16.12k £27.22k £67.08k £9.31k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £855.02k £893.70k £926.55k £1.00m £1.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £1.11k £965 £2.30k £2.64k
Expenditure - Governance £5.63k £5.50k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0