Governing document NORTON HOUSING AND SUPPORT LTD

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 DEC 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 OCT 1987 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16 FEB 2017 AS AMENDED ON 18 APR 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
1) THE PROVISION OF SOCIAL HOUSING FOR ADULTS WITH MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES, LEARNING DISABILITIES OR FROM OTHER DISADVANTAGED GROUPS. 2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE SUPPORT AND AFTER-CARE FOR ADULTS WITH MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES, LEARNING DISABILITIES OR FROM OTHER DISADVANTAGED GROUPS 3) THE PROVISION OF RECOVERY AND REHABILITATION SERVICES FOR ADULTS WITH MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES, LEARNING DISABILITIES OR FROM OTHER DISADVANTAGED GROUPS 4) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST ADULTS WITH MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES, LEARNING DISABILITIES OR FROM OTHER DISADVANTAGED GROUPS LIVING IN THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.