Financial history EGGLESCLIFFE PARISH HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 701844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £20.13k £15.13k £15.39k £13.01k £14.53k
Total expenditure £22.51k £10.80k £14.75k £10.08k £19.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £640
Income from government grants £10.75k £10.00k £2.67k N/A £1.00k