SOLIHULL SCHOOL PARENT'S ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 702099
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The association works to advance the education of pupils by developing relationships between parents, staff, pupils & others associated with the school. Engaging in activities which support the school & its pupils. Rendering assistance to the school & its pupils as appropriate.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £69,355
Total expenditure: £63,017

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Solihull

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 September 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • S S P A (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charles Fillingham Trustee 19 June 2023
BRING BACK BUGS
Received: On time
Lisa Harding Trustee 19 June 2023
None on record
Wenping Zhang Trustee 19 June 2023
None on record
Jayne Gooderidge Trustee 13 June 2022
None on record
Suchvinder Naga Trustee 13 June 2022
None on record
Aneesa Ahmed Trustee 13 June 2022
None on record
Freyja Ellard Trustee 21 June 2021
None on record
James Matthew Clark Trustee 21 June 2021
None on record
Meena Jindal Trustee 21 June 2021
None on record
Emma Seager Trustee 16 June 2020
None on record
Rachael Spiers Trustee 15 June 2020
None on record
Jo Belcuore-Groutage Trustee 10 June 2019
None on record
Lucy Lunt Trustee 10 June 2019
None on record
Julie Jones Trustee 21 June 2017
None on record
Michael Jones Trustee 21 June 2017
None on record
Vicki Whitfield Trustee 25 June 2014
None on record
Sue Cole Trustee 25 June 2014
None on record
SEAN ANDREW MORGAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £65.99k £33.18k £51.96k £62.59k £69.36k
Total expenditure £59.70k £17.69k £37.81k £64.02k £63.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 07 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 04 June 2024 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 04 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 20 June 2023 20 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 10 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 25 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 31 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 14 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 29 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 01/11/1939 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29/05/2014
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF SOLIHULL SCHOOL FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 22 September 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
109 Wells Green Road
SOLIHULL
B92 7PQ
Phone:
07771701632