Financial history THE FRIENDS OF JESMOND DENE

Charity number: 702260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.40k £1.93k £3.32k £1.04k £1.33k
Total expenditure £8.76k £2.70k £3.54k £678 £3.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A