Trustees THE FRIENDS OF JESMOND DENE
Charity number: 702260

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
clive Gerrard | Chair | 12 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Mcintire | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mcintire | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Newson | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Telfer | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacki Holmes | Trustee | 13 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Blakemore | Trustee | 17 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Carter | Trustee | 14 May 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.