Trustees ROTARY CLUB OF BELPER AND DUFFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
Charity number: 702340

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID DARWELL HENSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Martin Stamp | Trustee | 28 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Blurton | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
DIANE LOUISE SMILES | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Coral Lesley Breach | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles Martin Drake | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN SCOTNEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL ALFRED TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.