Accounts and annual returns DENIS MATTHEWS MEMORIAL TRUST FUND

Charity number: 702371
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 05 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 03 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 18 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 17 July 2020 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required