Financial history THE ROSSENDALE PLAYERS

Charity Number: 703158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £31.17k £11.56k £89.27k £27.14k £27.43k
Total expenditure £21.05k £13.84k £59.74k £37.73k £32.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A