Financial history INSURANCE ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 800007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £41.36k £18.60k £49.04k £68.11k £66.85k
Total expenditure £30.38k £12.22k £53.66k £54.43k £75.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A