Financial history THE BURNHAM ON SEA AND DISTRICT LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 800311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £4.96k £7.50k £3.06k £5.55k £4.12k
Total expenditure £4.35k £5.99k £4.58k £10.09k £10.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A