ST MARY'S OXTED HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the repair and restoration of St Mary's Church Oxted, and any buildings situated within the curtilage of the church including the hall, and the construction of any buildings within the curtilage. The Oxted community hall appeal committee was been formed to manage the project and raise funds for a new community hall. This appeal has now been wound up as it has achieved its objective.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 21 November 1988: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF ST MARYS (Working name)
- OXTED COMMUNITY HALL APPEAL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chloe Ashton | Chair | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN H FISHER FCMA | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Adamson | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Sullivan | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Nutley | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev James Paul Ashton | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|||||
ROBIN LISTER HICKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN HENRY FISHER FCMA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.39k | £4.56k | £16.47k | £17.90k | £1.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £26 | £75.00k | £37.39k | £7.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28TH OCTOBER 1988 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED 16TH DECEMBER 1991
Charitable objects
A(1) THE RESTORATION AND REPAIR OF THE CHURCH INCLUDING ALL SUCH WORKS OF RENEWAL TO ANY PART OF THE FABRIC THEREOF AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE REQUIRED. (2) THE LIKE WORKS OF RESTORATION REPAIR AND RENEWAL IN RESPECT OF ANY BUILDINGS WALLS GRAVESTONES MEMORIALS MONUMENTS OR OTHER STRUCTURES OR ARTEFACTS SITUATE WITHIN THE CURTILAGE OF THE CHURCH INCLUDING THE ROADWAY SURROUNDING THE SAME AND THE BUILDING OF THE CHURCH HALL AND ITS ADJACENT CAR PARK.(3) TEHE CONSTRUCTION EITHER WITHIN THE CHURCH OR WITHIN THE CURTILAGE THEREOF OF ADDITIONAL ACCOMODATION OR BUILDINGS FOR USE IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH. (4) THE NORMAL MAINTENANCE AND KEEPING IN REPAIR OF ANY PART OF THE PROPERTY REFERRED TO IN SUB PARAGRAPHS (1) (2) AND (3) OF THIS PARAGRAPH. B. THE RENEWAL REPLACEMENT OF THE ORGAN THE BELLS THE HEATING SYSTEM AND THE FIXED OR OTHER FURNISHINGS OF THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
OAK TREE COTTAGE
SANDY LANE
OXTED
RH8 9LU
- Phone:
- 01959561811
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window