Financial history ENGLISH NATIONAL BALLET SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity Number: 800512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.92m £2.05m £2.37m £2.17m £2.50m
Total expenditure £1.52m £2.33m £2.35m £2.13m £2.38m
Income from government contracts N/A £492.78k N/A £418.54k £254.99k
Income from government grants £416.02k £434.88k £368.63k £418.54k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £49.31k £123.47k £138.56k £154.05k £167.49k
Income - Other trading activities £800 £0 £375 £820 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.87m £1.93m £2.20m £2.01m £2.31m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.30k £832 £1.05k £7.26k £19.86k
Income - Other £0 £500 £21.33k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.52m £2.30m £2.31m £2.08m £2.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £35.28k £35.05k £47.38k £54.35k
Expenditure - Governance £32.89k £0 £22.28k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0