Financial history Plymouth Arts Cinema

Charity number: 800664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £241.60k £181.57k £170.92k £209.46k £231.87k
Total expenditure £247.22k £166.87k £212.88k £233.74k £231.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £62.50k £92.95k £56.55k £67.45k £25.00k