AVON TYRRELL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To allow the said property to be used by UK Youth as a residential centre and a place of training or education and outdoor activities for young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hampshire
Governance
- 01 February 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aaron Anthony Jose Hasan D'Souza | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||
David Thomlinson | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|||||||
RT HON THE LORD MANNERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
LADY JULIET ELIZABETH ANTHEA MANNERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 16TH SEPTEMBER 1946
Charitable objects
TO ALLOW THE SAID PROPERTY TO BE USED BY THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF YOUTH CLUBS AS A CONFERENCE HOUSE FOR ITS LEADERS OR MEMBERS OR PERSONS WORKING IN CONNECTION WITH IT OR AS A PLACE OF TRAINING OR EDUCATION FOR ANY OF ITS ACTIVITIES OR PURPOSES IN EACH CASE IN SUCH MANNER AND UPON SUCH TERMS OR CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK PROPER.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Uk Youth
Kings Buildings
16 Smith Square
LONDON
SW1P 3HQ
- Phone:
- 02031373817
- Email:
- alan.carr@ukyouth.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window