Trustees TREE REGISTER OF THE BRITISH ISLES
Charity number: 801565

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN HALL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Anderson | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Catherine Fitzgerald | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
PHILIPPA CLARE LEWIS | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
JILL BUTLER | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Murray Gouvenot Gardiner | Trustee | 29 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
LADY ARABELLA LENNOX-BOYD | Trustee | 27 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS FRANK DERMONT PAKENHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUPERT ELEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR TONY KIRKHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROY LANCASTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAURICE CURTIS FOSTER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.