Financial history THE SUSAN AND STEPHEN JAMES CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 801622
Charity reporting is up to date (179 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £125.52k £108.97k £98.52k £174.07k £199.72k
Total expenditure £113.58k £129.45k £105.06k £124.84k £108.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A