Financial history RENT-A-ROLE DRAMA SERVICE

Charity number: 801689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £838.58k £412.96k £674.98k £489.52k £414.41k
Total expenditure £789.45k £469.77k £584.89k £571.88k £479.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £34.00k £333.51k £27.60k £25.38k £20.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £4.07k N/A £22.23k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £31.80k N/A £56.60k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £802.17k N/A £595.39k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £543 N/A £769 N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £734.44k N/A £529.55k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £53.78k N/A £54.00k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £1.34k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £1.23k N/A £1.34k N/A N/A