Financial history BROOK HOSPITAL CANCER CARE CHARITY

Charity number: 801921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.73k £422 £68 £127 £390
Total expenditure £375 £325 £350 £350 £225
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A