Financial history ELIZABETH ANN LUCAS'S TECHNICAL SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 802232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £1.98k £2.01k £2.06k £2.13k £2.18k
Total expenditure £1.75k £270 £1.25k £798 £1.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A