THE C J M CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to other charities primarily involved in community and social matters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 November 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FARRER & CO TRUST CORPORATION LTD | Trustee | 14 May 2002 |
|
|||||
TIMOTHY JOHN MARKS | Trustee | 29 August 1989 |
|
|||||
MR CHRIS MARKS | Trustee | 29 August 1989 |
|
|||||
RUPERT PHILIP MARKS | Trustee | 29 August 1989 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM ROBERT MARKS | Trustee | 29 August 1989 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £503.60k | £228.25k | £297.95k | £433.28k | £58.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.86k | £62.86k | £82.24k | £118.71k | £40.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £435.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £285.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £30.38k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £37.78k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £68.16k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £700 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.03k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £65.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £700 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 April 2025 | 254 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 10 April 2025 | 254 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 November 2024 | 481 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 22 November 2024 | 481 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 August 2024 | 752 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 20 August 2024 | 752 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 July 2021 | 357 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 22 July 2021 | 357 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29TH AUGUST 1989
Charitable objects
THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 LINCOLN'S INN FIELDS
LONDON
WC2A 3LH
- Phone:
- 02072422022
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window