VOLUNTARY CARE - ROMFORD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide transport to and from hospital and / or doctors appointments. Collect prescriptions / shopping. Carry out minor repairs. Provide visitors for the lonely or housebound.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Havering
Governance
- 14 December 1989: Standard registration
- 19 October 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 19 October 2015: Funds transferred to 1146487 HOME FROM HOME FOR THE ELDERLY
- 19 October 2015: Funds transferred to 1051614 HAVERING SHOPMOBILITY ASSOCIATION
- 19 October 2015: Funds transferred to 1079969 TAPESTRY CARE UK
- COMMUNITY CARE - ROMFORD (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £730 | £967 | £986 | £796 | £2.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £967 | £1.61k | £1.28k | £1.31k | £1.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 24 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 16 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 13 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 28 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH NOVEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED 22ND OCTOBER 1990.
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF THE GREATER LONDON BOROUGH OF HAVERING, INCLUDING THE GENERAL AREAS OF CENTRAL ROMFORD, LONDON ROAD, GIDEA PARK, RISE PARK, COLLIER ROW, AND HAVERING-ATTE-BOWER WHO ARE IN NEED OF HELP BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, DISABILITY, SICKNESS, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH VOLUNTARY CARING WORK AS MAY BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window